EP2991191 - ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nate, Hiroshi c/o Toyoto Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15182892.8 | 28.08.2015 | [2016/09] | Priority number, date | JP20140173883 | 28.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014173883 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991191 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/14, H02J7/34 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
H02J7/1423 (EP,US);
B60R16/033 (EP,CN);
B60L53/30 (US);
B60L53/665 (EP,US);
B60L58/20 (EP,US);
B60R16/0315 (CN);
E05B81/82 (CN);
H01M10/44 (CN);
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
H02J2310/40 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/09] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2016/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0116213 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [X]EP1750346 (FUJITSU TEN LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2008029987 (SUGIYAMA MIZUHO [JP]); | [IY]US2009039707 (ISHIZEKI SEIICHI [JP]) | by applicant | JP2012240593 |