Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2991191
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.02.2019 |
First examination report |
|
31.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.03.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
29.01.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
28.08.2015 |
Change - representative |
|