Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9718369 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | B2 | US2016059722 | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014173883 | 28.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160026734 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014173883 | 28.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6379866B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B2 | JP2016047707 | 07.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014173883 | 28.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105383421B | Global Dossier | 08.05.2018 | B | CN105383421 | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014173883 | 28.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2902084 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014173883 | 28.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2991191 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014173883 | 28.08.2014 |