Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9627605 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2014049137 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11877516 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2024 | B2 | US2022393097 | 08.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | US201314032238 | 20.09.2013 | US201916556564 | 30.08.2019 | US202217891299 | 19.08.2022 | US201715455655 | 10.03.2017 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11469364 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | B2 | US2019386198 | 19.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | US201314032238 | 20.09.2013 | US201916556564 | 30.08.2019 | US201715455655 | 10.03.2017 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10446738 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2019 | B2 | US2017186939 | 29.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | US201314032238 | 20.09.2013 | US201715455655 | 10.03.2017 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5831542B | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | B2 | JPWO2012137897 | 28.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | JP2013508939 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5880645B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | B2 | JP2015057822 | 26.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | JP2014170011 | 25.08.2014 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5839091B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2016 | B2 | JP2015057598 | 26.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | JP2014170009 | 25.08.2014 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5907220B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2016 | B2 | JP2014240842 | 25.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | JP2014170010 | 25.08.2014 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2781886 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2017 | B1 | EP2781886 | 18.02.2015 | A3 | EP2781886 | 24.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | EP12768338 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2696163 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B1 | EP2696163 | 08.07.2015 | A4 | EP2696163 | 12.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107742670B | Global Dossier | 23.06.2020 | B | CN107742670 | 27.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | CN201280017462 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105352428B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | B | CN105352428 | 24.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | CN201280017462 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103492832B | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | B | CN103492832 | 01.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2982938 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B1 | EP2982938 | 10.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | WO2012JP59443 | 06.04.2012 | EP12768338 | 06.04.2012 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012137897 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6191717B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B2 | JP2016177802 | 06.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011101407 | 28.04.2011 | JP2011106990 | 12.05.2011 | JP2011086412 | 08.04.2011 | Type | Earlier application | EP2696163 |