EP2982938 - OPERATION DEVICE INCLUDING DISPLACEMENT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Masamichi Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Hideki Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/35] |
Former [2016/06] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15183008.0 | 06.04.2012 | [2016/06] | Priority number, date | JP20110086412 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011086412 | JP20110101407 | 28.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011101407 | JP20110106990 | 12.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011106990 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982938 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2982938 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/18, G01B7/16, G01L1/16, H01L41/113 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G01B7/16 (EP,CN,US);
H10N30/304 (CN,US);
H10N30/302 (EP,CN,US);
G01D5/18 (CN,US);
G01D5/185 (EP,US);
G01L1/16 (EP,CN,US);
H10N30/857 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2016/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BETRIEBSVORRICHTUNG MIT WEGSENSOR | [2016/06] | English: | OPERATION DEVICE INCLUDING DISPLACEMENT SENSOR | [2016/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FONCTIONNEMENT COMPRENANT UN CAPTEUR DE DÉPLACEMENT | [2016/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12768338.1 / EP2696163 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2012 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | IE | 06.04.2019 | LU | 06.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | FR | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.04.2012 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2019 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.04.2012 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2019 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2019 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2019 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.04.2019 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 06.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010104196 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [X]WO2010143528 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al); | [X]EP2288179 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [X]EP2290719 (SCHOOL CORP KANSAI UNIV [JP], et al); | [P]EP2408034 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | EP2442213 [ ] (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) |