EP2982695 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ANTIBODIES TO LINGO OR FRAGMENTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2019/12] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 250 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MI, Sha 4 Vernon Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
PEPINSKY, R. Blake 30 Falmouth Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
GRAFF, Christilyn 632 Massachusetts Avenue No. 614 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15183027.0 | 09.07.2009 | [2016/06] | Priority number, date | US20080079355P | 09.07.2008 Original published format: US 79355 P | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982695 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2982695 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/28 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K47/6879 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/35 (US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/71 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 10.08.2016 | BA | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT ANTIKÖRPERN GEGEN LINGO ODER FRAGMENTEN DAVON | [2016/06] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ANTIBODIES TO LINGO OR FRAGMENTS THEREOF | [2016/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES ANTICORPS ANTI-LINGO OU LEURS FRAGMENTS | [2016/06] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2018 | 08.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09788882.0 / EP2315779 | Divisional application(s) | EP19164797.3 Application refused : 11.08.2019 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2009 | AT | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | ES | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IE | 09.07.2019 | LU | 09.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.07.2009 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 09.07.2009 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006002437 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al); | [IY]WO2007008547 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2007098283 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al); | [IPY]WO2008086006 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US3773319 | EP0058481 | US4444887 | US4474893 | EP0133988 | WO8605807 | US4683195 | US4694778 | EP0239400 | US4714681 | US4716111 | US4741900 | WO8901036 | US4816567 | US4816397 | WO8912624 | WO9002809 | US4925648 | US4946778 | EP0396387 | WO9100360 | WO9109967 | WO9110737 | WO9110741 | WO9114438 | WO9201047 | WO9205793 | US5116964 | WO9208802 | WO9208495 | US5122464 | WO9218619 | WO9222324 | EP0519596 | WO9311236 | US5223409 | US5225539 | US5225538 | WO9317715 | US5258498 | EP0368684 | EP0592106 | WO9409817 | US5314995 | US5403484 | US5413923 | WO9515982 | US5427908 | WO9520401 | US5516637 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5565332 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571698 | US5574009 | US5573920 | US5580717 | US5585089 | US5589369 | US5591669 | US5601819 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5658727 | US5658570 | US5661016 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5693780 | US5698426 | US5731168 | US5733743 | US5736137 | WO9816654 | US5750753 | US5756096 | WO9824893 | US5780225 | US5807706 | US5807715 | US5811524 | US5814318 | US5821333 | US5821047 | WO9846645 | WO9850433 | US5837821 | WO9852976 | US5892019 | US5939598 | US5969108 | US6075181 | WO0034317 | WO0044788 | US6150584 | US6159730 | US6180370 | US6190370 | US6193980 | US6306365 | US6413777 | US6420140 | US2002102208 | WO02060955 | US2002123057 | US6458592 | US2002155537 | WO02096948 | US2003020734 | US2003157641 | WO2004085648 | WO2004US08323 | WO2005US22881 | WO2006US26271 | WO2008US00316 |