EP3135637 - SBR WASTE WATER TREATMENT PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLARO GmbH Spitzwegstrasse 63 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graf, Otto P. Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 6 79331 Teningen / DE | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 15183081.7 | 31.08.2015 | [2017/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135637 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C02F3/1263 (EP);
C02F3/1242 (EP);
C02F2203/006 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SBR-KLÄRANLAGE | [2017/09] | English: | SBR WASTE WATER TREATMENT PLANT | [2017/09] | French: | STATION D'EPURATION SBR | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2535317 (ATB UMWELTTECHNOLOGIEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * [A] 13-16 [I] 3-12; | [IA]DE102005034540 (JUNG PUMPEN GMBH [DE]) [I] 13-16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] * [A] 1-12; | [A]DE202005019918U (STEFFENS HINRICH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] *; | [A]DE102008038116 (BOLLER REINHARD [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0016] * |