EP2993343 - WIND TURBINE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramanathan, Subramanian Door No: 121 407B, Future Homes Thalambur Main Road Arasankazhani 600 130 Chennai / IN | For all designated states Prathish, Nelson 181-A, Type - 2 Block - 22, Neyveli Cuddalore District 607807 Tamil Nadu / IN | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2016/10] | Application number, filing date | 15183217.7 | 31.08.2015 | [2016/10] | Priority number, date | US201414474318 | 02.09.2014 Original published format: US201414474318 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993343 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/06, F03D3/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
F03D3/067 (EP,US);
F03D3/002 (EP,US);
F05B2240/211 (EP,US);
F05B2240/2212 (EP,US);
F05B2240/311 (EP,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2016/10] | English: | WIND TURBINE SYSTEM | [2016/10] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉOLIENNE | [2016/10] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB2489325 (MARSHALL JOHN TIMOTHY JAMES [GB]) [X] 1-7,11 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 4 * * figure - * [Y] 13 [I] 8-10,12; | [XYI]GB2071773 (LIU THUNG CHI, et al) [X] 1-9,11 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 98 * * figures 3-8 * [Y] 13 [I] 10,12; | [YA]NL2008227C (GROUNDTRACER B V) [Y] 13 * abstract * * page 12, line 5 - page 20, line 34 * * figure - * [A] 1-12; | [A]KR101034924B (WOO JUNG TAEK [KR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 2-7 * |