EP3001282 - MOBILE WATCH TYPE TERMINAL AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL, 07336 / KR | [2018/49] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seojin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 02 /
YU, Donghwan IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 03 /
KIM, Samsick IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 15183906.5 | 04.09.2015 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | KR20140129206 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: KR 20140129206 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3001282 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3001282 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F1/16, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/36, H04M1/725, H04W4/02, H04W4/21 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
G06Q20/321 (EP);
H04M1/72412 (US);
G06F1/163 (US);
G06F1/1694 (US);
G06F3/014 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3224 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q20/36 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/21 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | G06F3/01, G06Q20/32, G06Q30/06, H04W4/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2016/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT IN FORM EINER UHR UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/13] | English: | MOBILE WATCH TYPE TERMINAL AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF | [2016/13] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE D'HORLOGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 24.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2018 | 08.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2015 | AL | 06.03.2019 | AT | 06.03.2019 | CY | 06.03.2019 | CZ | 06.03.2019 | DK | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | ES | 06.03.2019 | FI | 06.03.2019 | HR | 06.03.2019 | IT | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | MK | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | NL | 06.03.2019 | PL | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | RS | 06.03.2019 | SE | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SK | 06.03.2019 | SM | 06.03.2019 | TR | 06.03.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | NO | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | PT | 06.07.2019 | GB | 04.09.2019 | IE | 04.09.2019 | LU | 04.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.09.2015 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
GB | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 04.09.2015 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
GB | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
GB | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
GB | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
AT | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2005093868 (HINCKLEY KENNETH P [US]) [I] 1,2,9-12,19-21 * paragraphs [0002] , [0065] , [0093] , [0094] , [0098] , [0099] , [0119] - [0120] - [0251]; claims 17,25,26,35 * [Y] 3-8,13-18; | [Y]US2007188323 (SINCLAIR MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 8,18 * paragraphs [0005] , [0021] , [0024] *; | [IY]WO2011066381 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al) [I] 1,2,9-12,19-21 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0041] , [0048] - [0050] - [0054] , [0098] * [Y] 3-8,13-18; | [Y]US2013127636 (ARYANPUR RAMEEN [US], et al) [Y] 8,18 * paragraphs [0078] , [0079] *; | [A]US2014282270 (SLONNEGER ANDREW M [US]) [A] 1-21* the whole document * |