01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
13.09.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
26.07.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
05.10.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
02.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
16.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
09.03.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
18.12.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
24.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
02.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.08.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
11.08.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
30.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] |
04.09.2015 |
Change - representative |
|