Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018226668 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP68228 | 29.07.2016 | EP15306250 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180034513 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP68228 | 29.07.2016 | EP15306250 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018530856 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP68228 | 29.07.2016 | EP15306250 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107851822 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP68228 | 29.07.2016 | EP15306250 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017021331 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15306250 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3125348 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2018 | B1 | EP3125348 | 01.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15306250 | 31.07.2015 |