EP2998256 - DEVICE FOR GUIDING AN ELONGATE PRODUCT AND STORAGE FACILITY INCLUDING SUCH A GUIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGC ZI du Chateau rue Denis Papin 62220 Carvin / FR | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYMONENQ, Allan 25 rue du Calvaire 44390 LES TOUCHES / FR | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Godineau, Valérie Ipsilon 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Godineau, Valérie Ipsilon Brema-Loyer 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | Application number, filing date | 15184251.5 | 08.09.2015 | [2016/12] | Priority number, date | FR20140058800 | 18.09.2014 Original published format: FR 1458800 | [2016/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2998256 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/28, B63B21/66, B65H57/04, B65H75/44 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
B65H57/04 (EP);
B63B21/663 (EP);
B65H54/2812 (EP);
B65H75/4402 (EP);
B65H2701/3917 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN LÄNGLICHES PRODUKT, UND RANGIERANLAGE, DIE EINE SOLCHE FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG UMFASST | [2016/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR GUIDING AN ELONGATE PRODUCT AND STORAGE FACILITY INCLUDING SUCH A GUIDING DEVICE | [2016/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE DE PRODUIT ALLONGÉ ET INSTALLATION DE RANGEMENT INTÉGRANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 02.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CH355914 (WILHELM STOEHR SPEZIALFABRIK F [DE]) [X] 1,2,12 * page 1-, lines 62-69; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,6-11 [I] 5; | [XI]DE1011029 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,12 * column 1, lines 1-32; figure 1 * [I] 5-7,10,11; | [A]US3025009 (ASCHINGER HAROLD W) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3347526 (THOMAS CYMMER, et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,1a *; | [A]US4516446 (FLOHN PAUL H [US]) [A] 1,2,12 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0110821 |