EP3100952 - ARMREST STRUCTURE AND AIRCRAFT SEAT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aircom Pacific Inc 99 South Almaden Boulevard Suite 600 San Jose, CA 95113 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIH, Daniel AIRCOM PACIFIC INC 4416 Jordan Ranch Drive Dublin, CA 94568 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Edificio Aqua, Calle Agustín de Foxá 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Arpe Fernandez, Manuel de Guzmán el Bueno, 133 (Edificio Germania) 28003 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15184499.0 | 09.09.2015 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | TW20150118051 | 04.06.2015 Original published format: TW 104118051 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100952 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06, B60N2/46 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
B64D11/0644 (EP,US);
B60N2/75 (EP,US);
B60N2/753 (EP,US);
B64D11/0646 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARMLEHNENSTRUKTUR UND FLUGZEUGSITZ | [2016/49] | English: | ARMREST STRUCTURE AND AIRCRAFT SEAT THEREOF | [2016/49] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ACCOUDOIR ET SIÈGE D'AÉRONEF ASSOCIÉ | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2698276 (AIRBUS SAS [FR]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 18] , [0 19] * [I] 2-7,10-15; | [X]US2014217798 (NEGUSSE ISAAC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-11,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 4] , [0 22] , [0 23] *; | [XI]JPH1075847 (TAKANO CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * figures 1, 2, 3 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * [I] 9-16; | [A]US2015084393 (CHANG ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] *; | [A]US2007085389 (SCHURG HARTMUT [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] * |