EP2998921 - BEACON DEVICE FOR FACILITATION OF GRATUITOUS TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MiPayWay LLC 3331 Heritage Trade Dr., Suite 103 Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | [2016/48] |
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states Bell, Brian P. 5928 Two Pines Trail Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 15184546.8 | 09.09.2015 | [2016/12] | Priority number, date | US201414487482 | 16.09.2014 Original published format: US201414487482 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2998921 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q20/32 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G06Q20/145 (EP,US);
G06Q20/0855 (EP,US);
G06Q20/327 (US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0279 (EP,US);
H04W40/244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAKENVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG BELIEBIGER TRANSAKTIONEN | [2016/12] | English: | BEACON DEVICE FOR FACILITATION OF GRATUITOUS TRANSACTIONS | [2016/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BALISE POUR LA FACILITATION DE TRANSACTIONS NON-SOLICITÉES | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010063889 (PROCTOR JR JAMES ARTHUR [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] *; | [I]US2013273843 (SHIMOTA JAMES A [US], et al) [I] 1-14* paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] * |