06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
15.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
24.02.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
18.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
30.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
18.03.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
14.03.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.02.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
06.12.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2018 |
First examination report |
|
02.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.02.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
10.02.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.02.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
11.09.2015 |
Change - representative |
|