Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10624689 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2020 | B2 | US2017071653 | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102280370B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2021 | B1 | KR20170031031 | 20.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6723880B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2020 | B2 | JP2017051615 | 16.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106510838B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | B | CN106510838 | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3141203 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2022 | B1 | EP3141203 | 15.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102016016736 | 02.08.2022 | B1 | BR102016016736 | 14.03.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3141203T | 13.06.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2724014 | 18.06.2020 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP15184682 | 10.09.2015 |