Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
06.11.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.08.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.07.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
28.07.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 | Change - designated states | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
23.12.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
04.11.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.05.2016 | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.04.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.01.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |