EP3120896 - A SYSTEM, AN APPARATUS, AND A METHOD FOR TREATING A SEXUAL DYSFUNCTIONAL FEMALE PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirk Promotion LTD. Frejgatan 13, Att. 1492 114 79 Stockholm / SE | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Route des Iles 2B 1897 Bouveret / CH | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15185188.8 | 09.10.2009 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | SE20080002162 | 10.10.2008 Original published format: SE 0802162 | [2017/04] | Previously filed application, date | WO2009SE51127 | 09.10.2009 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120896 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/05, A61B17/12, A61B5/00, A61F2/06, // A61F7/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
A61N1/0524 (EP,US);
A61H19/34 (US);
A61B5/4368 (EP,US);
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61N1/36107 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2017/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER PATIENTIN MIT SEXUELLER DYSFUNKTION | [2017/04] | English: | A SYSTEM, AN APPARATUS, AND A METHOD FOR TREATING A SEXUAL DYSFUNCTIONAL FEMALE PATIENT | [2017/04] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UNE PATIENTE SOUFFRANT DE TROUBLES SEXUELS | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09819499.6 / EP2349025 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0023030 (MEDOC LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2, 8-10 * * page 1, line 28 - page 23, line 2 *; | [X]WO0152931 (IMPULSE DYNAMICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1253877 (POTENCIA MEDICAL AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007092862 (GERBER MARTIN T [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2007121107 (GLOTH DAVID [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2A * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | [XP]WO2009048392 (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU], et al) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2009048383 (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU], et al) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6464653 | US6486207 | US7081087 | US2008103544 | - PAULS ET AL., OBSTRET GYNECOL SURV, (2005), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 3196 - 205 |