EP2947203 - USE OF CELLULOSIC FIBRE PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smurfit Kappa Paper Holdings France 2 rue Goethe 75116 Paris / FR | [2022/28] |
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states Smurfit Kappa Paper Holdings France 2 rue Goethe 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENAFF, Jean Résidence Les Madrigaux M 39 66 rue Lafitte 33400 Talence / FR | 02 /
BREDEMO, Ronald Solbacksgatan 4 941 36 Piteå / SE | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2022/28] |
Former [2018/45] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2015/48] | Presland, Torbjörn Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15185250.6 | 15.09.2015 | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2947203 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2947203 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2947203 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2947203 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/10, B65D65/38, D21H11/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
D21H27/10 (EP,US);
D21H11/14 (US);
D21H11/00 (EP,US);
D21H11/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2015/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Cellulosefaserstoffbreis | [2021/45] | English: | USE OF CELLULOSIC FIBRE PULP | [2015/48] | French: | Utilisation de pâte de fibres cellulosiques | [2021/45] |
Former [2015/48] | VERWENDUNG EINES CELLULOSEFASERSTOFFBREIS | ||
Former [2015/48] | UTILISATION DE PÂTE DE FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES | Examination procedure | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 28.12.2016 | Observations by third parties | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.08.2019
08.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE SCA Forest Products AB 85188 Sundsvall / SE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2019/37] | 22.08.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.12.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2020 | 18.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2020 | 14.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.06.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2015 | AL | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | LU | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.09.2015 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | HR | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HR | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003051837 (SILENIUS PETRI [FI]) [X] 1,11 * claims 8-10 *[I] 1-14; | [XDI]US2004168781 (SILENIUS PETRI [FI]) [XD] 1,11 * claims 1-10 * [I] 1-14; | [XI]WO2010149711 (INTERFACE INTERNAT B V [NL], et al) [X] 1,11 * claims 6,17 * [I] 1-14 | by applicant | US2004168781 | US8231764 | other | - AALTIO, E.A., "The role of highly beaten birch pulp fraction on the properties of kraft paper", Paperi Puu No 4a, (19620000), page 217 | - "The significance of structure for the compression behavior", FELLERS, C., Paperstructure and properties., Marcel Dekker, (19860000), page 281 | - HTUN, M.; FELLERS, C., The invariant mechanical properties of oriented handsheets, Tappi, (19820000), vol. 65, page 113 | - NORDSTROM, B., "Effects of pulp type and headbox design on anisotropy and other sheet properties in twin-wire roll forming", Nord. Pulp Paper Res. J., (20030000), vol. 18, no. 3, page 288 | - NORDSTROM, B., "Two-stage versus one-stage refining of unbleached softwood kraft pulp - effects on tensile properties and compression strength", Nord. Pulp Paper Res. J., (20150000), vol. 30, no. 3, page 461 | Opposition | EP2947203 | - Nordström, "Two-stage versus one-stage refining of unbleached softwood kraft pulp - effects on tensile properties and compression strength", Nordic Pulp & Paper Research Journal, (20150000), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 461 - 465, XP055839623 | - AALTIO E.A., "The effect of highly beaten birch pulp fraction on the properties of kraft paper", Papper och Trä, (19620000), pages 217 - 222, XP055628614 | - PETTERSSON G. et al., "Strong and bulky paperboard sheets from surface modified CTMP, manufactured at low energy", Nordic Pulp & Paper Research Journal, (20150000), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 319 - 325, XP055628618 | - FELLERS C., "The Significance of Structure for the Compression Behavior of Paperboard", Paper Structure and Properties, New York, (19860000), pages 292 - 297; 308-310, XP055628619 | - CLARK, J. D' A., "Pulp Technology and Treatment for Paper, second edition", Pulp Technology and Treatment for Paper, second edition, San Francisco, (19850000), pages 779 - 781, XP055628621 | - SAKAEMURA et al., "Strength properties of wet combination paper", Japan Tappi J., (20130000), vol. 67, no. 8, pages 68 - 74, XP055628624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2524/jtappij.67.900 | - Anonymous, "Svensk Standard, SS-ISO 9895: 2009", Swedish standard institute, (20090407), pages 1 - 10, XP055628638 | - Anonymous, "Paperboard", Wikipedia, pages 1 - 5, XP055628636 | - AALTIO E.A., "The effect of highly beaten birch pulp fraction on the properties of kraft paper", Papper och Trä, (19620000), pages 217 - 222 | - PETTERSSON G. et al., "Strong and bulky paperboard sheets from surface modified CTMP, manufactured at low energy", Nordic Pulp & Paper Research Journal, (20150000), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 319 - 325 | - SAKAEMURA et al., "Strength properties of wet combination paper", Japan Tappi J., (20130000), vol. 67, no. 8, pages 68 - 74 |