EP3144957 - A METHOD FOR FABRICATING A NANOSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstrasse 21 80333 München / DE | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koblmüller, Gregor Weingasse 6 93047 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
Mayer, Benedikt Klenzestrasse 81 80469 Munich / DE | 03 /
Finley, Jonathan Münchner Strasse 16 b 85609 Aschheim / DE | 04 /
Abstreiter, Gerhard Kochstrasse 31 85399 Hallbergmoos / DE | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstraße 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15185295.1 | 15.09.2015 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3144957 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, B82Y10/00, B82Y30/00, H01L33/18 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
H01S5/341 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02603 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02546 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02631 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02639 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/18 (EP,KR,US);
H01S5/021 (US);
H01S5/0218 (US);
H01S5/1042 (US);
H01S5/343 (US);
H01S5/4025 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01S2304/00 (EP,US);
H01S2304/02 (US);
H01S2304/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG NANOSKALIGER STRUKTUREN | [2017/12] | English: | A METHOD FOR FABRICATING A NANOSTRUCTURE | [2017/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE NANO-STRUCTURE | [2017/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008110486 (TSAKALAKOS LOUCAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [IY]US2011139209 (LANG CHRISTIAN [GB], et al) [I] 1-8,13-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0178]; figures 1-15 * [Y] 9-12; | [Y] - NOBORISAKA JINICHIRO ET AL, "Catalyst-free growth of GaAs nanowires by selective-area metalorganic vapor-phase epitaxy", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (20050516), vol. 86, no. 21, doi:10.1063/1.1935038, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 213102 - 213102, XP012065664 [Y] 9-12 * pages 213101-1 - pages 213101-3; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1935038 | [Y] - NOBORISAKA J ET AL, "Fabrication and characterization of freestanding GaAs/AlGaAs core-shell nanowires and AlGaAs nanotubes by using selective-area metalorganic vapor phase epitaxy", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (20050824), vol. 87, no. 9, doi:10.1063/1.2035332, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 93109 - 093109, XP012077641 [Y] 9-12 * pages 093109-1 - pages 093109-2; figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2035332 |