Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
21.01.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.09.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.08.2018 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
23.05.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.02.2018 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
09.10.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.09.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.05.2017 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
06.01.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.12.2016 | First examination report | |
30.09.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
30.09.2016 | Change - designated states | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.03.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
18.09.2015 | Change - representative |