EP2998371 - RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA, Ippei c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 15185717.4 | 17.09.2015 | [2016/12] | Priority number, date | JP20140191845 | 19.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014191845 | JP20150123636 | 19.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015123636 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2998371 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/322, B41M5/00, C09D11/54 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
B41M5/0017 (EP,US);
B41J2/21 (US);
B41M5/50 (US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/12] | English: | RECORDING METHOD | [2016/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005206702 (YAMASHITA KUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * examples; claims *; | [X]EP2083055 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-9 * claims 7,8 * * page examples * * paragraphs [0146] , [0149] , [0152] , [0155] * * tables 2-4 *; | [X]EP2090624 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * examples;; claims 1,9,10 * * paragraphs [0119] , [0125] , [0128] *; | [X]US2009233061 (IRITA KIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0195] - paragraph [0220] * * paragraphs [0064] , [0067] , [0 95] , [ 216] , [ 234] , [ 235] * * claim 1 *; | [X]US2010055325 (SAKAI MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * examples;; claims 1-4,11,12; tables 1-3 * * paragraphs [0211] , [ 238] - [0247] - [ 250] - [0261] *; | [X]US2013044157 (SARKISIAN GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * examples 1-3 * * tables 1,2 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0045] *; | [X]US2014043393 (TAKEUCHI NORIYASU [JP]) [X] 1-9 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0 53] - [0058] - [0124] , [0126] , [0127] , [0128] *; | [XP]EP2857213 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,3-7,9 * claims 1,4,6 * * examples * * tables 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0164] *; | [XP]EP2894203 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-9 * claims; examples * * tables 1-3 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0090] , [0106] , [ 135] - [0138] - [0146] - [0150] * * figure *; | [E]EP2944476 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-9 * examples;; claim 1 * * tables 1-4 ** paragraphs [0006] , [0082] , [0085] , [0086] * | by applicant | JP2005225114 |