EP3144634 - RECONSTRUCTING TRACKS USING ELECTRONIC MAP DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TomTom Navigation B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Johannes Robert De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Grothklags, Sven De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Sasse, Jan-Ole De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Dobson, Adrian TomTom International B.V. IP Creation De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Dobson, Adrian TomTom International B.V. IP Creation De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 15186139.0 | 21.09.2015 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3144634 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/30 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G01C21/30 (EP,US);
G01C21/3667 (US);
G01C21/3626 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKONSTRUKTION VON SPUREN MITTELS DATEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN KARTE | [2017/12] | English: | RECONSTRUCTING TRACKS USING ELECTRONIC MAP DATA | [2017/12] | French: | RECONSTRUCTION D'ITINÉRAIRES À L'AIDE DES DONNÉES DE CARTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2017/12] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 23.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/12] | Request for further processing for: | 26.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008253688 (SAFRA ELIYAHU [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0149] *; | [YD]WO2015132407 (TOMTOM INT BV [NL]) [YD] 1-15 * page 6, lines 17-23 * | by applicant | WO0040930 | WO2007079042 | WO2015132407 |