EP2987864 - METHOD FOR DETECTING AN ANALYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/08] | HIGH THROUGHPUT NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING BY EXPANSION AND RELATED METHODS | ||
[2017/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratos Genomics Inc. 2211 Elliott Avenue, Suite 210 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOKORIS, Mark, Stamatios 10535 Northeast 196th Street Bothell, WA 98011 / US | 02 /
MCRUER, Robert, N. 9242 Southeast 46th Street Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 15186257.0 | 29.01.2010 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | US20090148332P | 29.01.2009 Original published format: US 148332 P | US20090148334P | 29.01.2009 Original published format: US 148334 P | US20090148327P | 29.01.2009 Original published format: US 148327 P | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2987864 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2987864 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/34, G01N33/48, C12Q1/68 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12P19/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2525/101, C12Q2525/197, C12Q2563/113, C12Q2563/116, C12Q2565/631 (EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/631, C12Q2525/204, C12Q2525/197 (US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES ANALYTEN | [2017/42] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING AN ANALYTE | [2017/42] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR DÉTECTER UN ANALYTE | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/08] | HOCHDURCHSATZ-NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZIERUNG MITTELS EXPANSION UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2016/08] | HIGH THROUGHPUT NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING BY EXPANSION AND RELATED METHODS | ||
Former [2016/08] | SÉQUENÇAGE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE HAUT RENDEMENT PAR EXPANSION ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Examination procedure | 22.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 22.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10736501.7 / EP2391726 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2010 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.01.2010 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1645628 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0025] , [0089] * * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 10-15[I] 4-9,16,17 | by applicant | WO9202258 | WO9310820 | WO9422892 | WO9424144 | US5432272 | US6150510 | US6242589 | US6329178 | US6395524 | US6602695 | US7060440 | US2007048748 | WO2008157696 | WO2009055617 | - FASMAN, Practical Handbook of Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, CRC PRESS, (1989), pages 385 - 394 | - METZKER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, no. 20, page 4259 | - EFIMOV ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 4416 - 4426 | - MAG ET AL., "Synthesis and selective cleavage of an oligodeoxynucleotide containing a bridged internucleotide 5'-phosphorothioate linkage", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 1437 - 1441 | - MAG ET AL., "Synthesis and selective cleavage of oligodeoxyribonucleotides containing non-chiral internucleotide phosphoramidate linkages", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 17, pages 5973 - 5988, XP002112660 | - GUT ET AL., "A novel procedure for efficient genotyping of single nucleotide polymorphisms", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/28.5.e13, page E13, XP002158531 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.5.e13 | - ECKSTEIN ET AL., "Inhibition of restriction endonuclease hydrolysis by phosphorothioate-containing DNA", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19881225), vol. 17, no. 22, page 9495 | - SAUER ET AL., "MALDI mass spectrometry analysis of single nucleotide polymorphisms by photocleavage and charge-tagging", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gng062, page E63, XP002259261 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gng062 | - VALLONE ET AL., "Genotyping SNPs using a UV-photocleavable oligonucleotide in MALDI-TOF MS", METHODS MOL. BIO., (2005), vol. 297, pages 169 - 78 | - ORDOUKHANIAN ET AL., "Design and synthesis of a versatile photocleavable DNA building block, application to phototriggered hybridization", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 117, doi:doi:10.1021/ja00142a028, pages 9570 - 9571, XP002072978 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00142a028 | - H.S. LEE; D.S. KIM; T.H. KWON, "UV nano embossing for polymer nano structures with non-transparent mold insert", MICROSYSTEM TECHNOLOGIES, (2007), vol. 13, pages 593 - 599, XP019492794 |