EP3002570 - BOLOMETRIC DETECTOR WITH MIM STRUCTURES HAVING DIFFERENT DIMENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALANCHOKE, Ujwol 28, rue Glandeves 13001 MARSEILLE / FR | 02 /
BOUTAMI, Salim 25, rue Lavoisier 38100 GRENOBLE / FR | 03 /
POCAS, Stéphane 12, rue Hoche 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | 04 /
RABAUD, Wilfried 128, rue Albert Soboul 38250 VILLARD-DE-LANS / FR | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15186326.3 | 22.09.2015 | [2016/14] | Priority number, date | FR20140059157 | 26.09.2014 Original published format: FR 1459157 | [2016/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3002570 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/20, G01J5/08 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
G01J5/20 (EP,US);
G01J5/22 (US);
G01J5/0853 (EP,US);
G01J2005/202 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOLOMETRISCHER DETEKTOR MIT MIM-STRUKTUREN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER GRÖSSE | [2016/14] | English: | BOLOMETRIC DETECTOR WITH MIM STRUCTURES HAVING DIFFERENT DIMENSIONS | [2016/14] | French: | DETECTEUR BOLOMETRIQUE A STRUCTURES MIM DE DIMENSIONS DIFFERENTES | [2016/14] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 06.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]FR2977937 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [I] 1-4,8-14,16 * figures 3B, 4C, 6A, 8C, 8D * * page 19, line 1 - line 14 * * page 22, line 2 - line 4 * * page 22, line 17 - line 28 * * page 25, line 21 - line 29 * * claim 13 * [Y] 5-7,15; | [Y]FR2994596 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 15* claim 1 *; | [Y]US2014175284 (ROH SOOK-YOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 5-7 * figure 6 *; | [A] - JAN KISCHKAT ET AL, "Mid-infrared optical properties of thin films of aluminum oxide, titanium dioxide, silicon dioxide, aluminum nitride, and silicon nitride", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 51, no. 28, doi:10.1364/AO.51.006789, ISSN 0003-6935, (20121001), pages 6789 - 6798, (20121001), XP001578435 [A] 1 * tables 4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.51.006789 | by applicant | WO2013010933 |