Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
05.05.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.11.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.09.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.06.2017 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
04.01.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.12.2016 | First examination report | |
29.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
19.08.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
19.08.2016 | Change - designated states | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
05.04.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
23.09.2015 | Change - representative |