Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9784623 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2016091371 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1459157 | 26.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016070935 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1459157 | 26.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3002570 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1459157 | 26.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3026483 | 01.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1459157 | 26.09.2014 |