EP3006809 - PROTECTIVE HOOD WITH PIVOTING ATTACHMENT SYSTEM FOR A GAS CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRENAL, Antoine 30, rue des Ecoles 95460 EZANVILLE / FR | 02 /
GRAVIERE, Vincent 40-42 rue Jules Vanzuppe 94200 Ivry Sur Seine / FR | 03 /
LIGONESCHE, Renaud 31, Boulevard Joffre 95220 HERBLAY / FR | 04 /
TARANTELLO, Chiara 1 cours Maréchal Leclerc 92800 PUTEAUX / FR | 05 /
TREVISAN, Adrien 18 boulevard Maillot 92200 NEUILLY SUR SEINE / FR | 06 /
VIGNEROL, Samuel 28 rue Pierre et Marie Curie 95380 LOUVRES / FR | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 15187939.2 | 16.02.2015 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | FR20140052039 | 12.03.2014 Original published format: FR 1452039 | [2016/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006809 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006809 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/06 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
F17C13/06 (EP,US);
F17C1/00 (US);
A61M16/10 (EP,US);
A61M2209/082 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0114 (EP,US);
F17C2201/032 (EP,US);
F17C2201/058 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0165 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0188 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0308 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0329 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0338 (EP,US);
F17C2221/011 (EP,US);
F17C2221/014 (EP,US);
F17C2221/017 (EP,US);
F17C2221/03 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHUTZHAUBE MIT SCHWENKBAREM EINRASTSYSTEM FÜR GASFLASCHE | [2016/15] | English: | PROTECTIVE HOOD WITH PIVOTING ATTACHMENT SYSTEM FOR A GAS CYLINDER | [2016/15] | French: | CAPOTAGE DE PROTECTION AVEC SYSTÈME D ACCROCHAGE PIVOTANT POUR BOUTEILLE DE GAZ | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 18.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15305224.6 / EP2918893 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2015 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 16.02.2015 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 16.02.2015 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2246596 (ARROWFORGE LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-15* page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 12 *; | [A]EP0629812 (FRANCE PROD OXYGENES CO [FR]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 28-42 *; | [A]DE10057469 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0017] , [0020] - [0021] *; | [A]US2009272443 (LEE CHI PING [TW]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,10 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0019] , [0022] , [0024] , [0026] - [0029] - [0034] *; | [A]EP2330335 (VETTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-2 *; | [IY]FR2976048 (AIR LIQUIDE MEDICAL SYSTEMS [FR]) [I] 1-7,9,11-15 * page 1, lines 11-16; figure 12.13 * * page 2, lines 26-28 * * page 3, lines 9-15,37-38 * * page 5, lines 37-38 * * page 6, lines 17-18 * * page 7, lines 31-32 * * page 8, lines 14-17 * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 3 * [Y] 8,10; | [XYI]EP2586481 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] , [0044] , [0059] * [Y] 8,10 [I] 11,12 | by applicant | EP0629812 | DE10057469 | US2004020793 | EP2586481 |