10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
07.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
08.02.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
02.03.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
27.02.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.01.2017 |
First examination report |
|
14.10.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
14.10.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
10.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.04.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
06.10.2015 |
Change - representative |
|