EP3009586 - A MOVING HINGE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heksagon Muhendislik ve Tasarim Anonim Sirketi Buyukdere Caddesi Is Kuleleri 2. Blok Kat: 6 Besiktas Istanbul / TR | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYDIN, TARIK HEKSAGON MUHENDISLIK VE TASARIM ANONIM SIRKETI TAYSAD Organize Sanayi Bolgesi (TOSB), 1. Cadde 15. Yol, No:7, Sekerp nar KOCAELI / TR | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Dericioglu Kurt, Ekin Ankara Patent Bureau Limited Kavaklidere Mahallesi Bestekar Caddesi No: 10 06680 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Dericioglu Kurt, Ekin Ankara Patent Bureau Limited Bestekar Sokak No: 10 Kavaklidere 06680 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 15188605.8 | 06.10.2015 | [2016/16] | Priority number, date | TR20140012097 | 15.10.2014 Original published format: TR 201412097 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009586 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04, E05D5/04 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
B60J5/0491 (EP);
E05D5/043 (EP);
E05D7/04 (EP);
E05Y2900/50 (EP);
E05Y2900/506 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGTSCHARNIERMECHANISMUS | [2016/16] | English: | A MOVING HINGE MECHANISM | [2016/16] | French: | MÉCANISME DE CHARNIÈRE MOBILE | [2016/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US6286185 (RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]) [XD] 1-6,8,9 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 50; figures 1-22 * [A] 7,10; | [I]FR2856421 (PORTAC [FR]) [I] 1-3,5-10 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 26; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2007169311 (FRANCHINI GIAN CARLO [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] - [0032] , [0034]; figures 1,2,3,7,8,9 * [I] 2-6,8,9 | by applicant | US6286185 | CN202064752U |