EP3005976 - PROCESS FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES AND PROCESS FOR MAKING DENTAL WAFERS AND DENTAL WAFER FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | PROCESS FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES AND PROCESS FOR MAKING DENTAL WAFERS AND AND DENTAL WAFER FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES | ||
[2016/24] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro.Medica S.R.L. Via Cavour 4/6 27030 Palestro (PV) / IT | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRRONIS, Giuseppe Via Cavour 4/6 27030 PALESTRO (PV) / IT | 02 /
PADERNO, Alessandra Via Palestro 4/6 27030 PALESTRO (PV) / IT | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Biallo, Dario, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15189009.2 | 08.10.2015 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | IT2014MI01780 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: IT MI20141780 | [2016/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005976 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3005976 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/01, A61C13/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C13/0022 (US);
A61C13/0003 (US);
A61C13/0006 (EP,US);
A61C13/01 (EP,US);
A61C13/09 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZAHNPROTHESEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DENTALSCHEIBENROHLINGEN UND DENTALSCHEIBENROHLING ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZAHNPROTHESEN | [2016/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES AND PROCESS FOR MAKING DENTAL WAFERS AND DENTAL WAFER FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES | [2016/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FORMATION DE PROTHÈSES DENTAIRES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUETTES DENTAIRE ET PLAQUETTE DENTAIRE POUR LA FORMATION DE PROTHÈSES DENTAIRES | [2016/15] |
Former [2016/15] | PROCESS FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES AND PROCESS FOR MAKING DENTAL WAFERS AND AND DENTAL WAFER FOR THE FORMATION OF DENTAL PROSTHESES | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 16.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6220862 (CASELLINI FERNANDO [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-13 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1A-3 * [A] 4,10 [I] 3,9; | [XA]JP2002104914 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,9; | [XA]US2004146833 (DYER SCOTT R [US]) [X] 2,4-8,10-13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-13D * [A] 1,3,9; | [XA]EP2522302 (ZAHNTECHNIK TRIPP GMBH [DE]) [X] 2,4,6,8,10,12,13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-6 * [A] 1,3,5,7,9,11; | [XP]EP2839807 (MICRO MEDICA S R L [IT]) [XP] 1-13* paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-12 * |