EP3029851 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN OPTIMAL RECEIVED SIGNAL OF A MULTI-ANTENNA SYSTEM FOR A FM-EQUIVALENT CHANNEL RECEPTION FOR A RECEIVING FREQUENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tran, Manh-Thang Sohldfeld 235 31139 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
Nyenhuis, Detlev Hauptstr. 7 31079 Sibbesse / DE | 03 /
Risse, Marcus Christ.-Hackethal-Str. 59 31139 Hildesheim / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 15189049.8 | 09.10.2015 | [2016/23] | Priority number, date | DE201410224953 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014224953 | [2016/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029851 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3029851 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H04B7/0817 (EP);
H04B7/0865 (EP);
H04B7/0871 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2016/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES OPTIMALEN EMPFANGSSIGNALS VON EINEM MEHRANTENNENSYSTEM BEI EINEM FM-GLEICHKANALEMPFANG FÜR EINE EMPFANGSFREQUENZ | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN OPTIMAL RECEIVED SIGNAL OF A MULTI-ANTENNA SYSTEM FOR A FM-EQUIVALENT CHANNEL RECEPTION FOR A RECEIVING FREQUENCY | [2016/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION D'UN SIGNAL DE RECEPTION OPTIMAL D'UN SYSTEME MULTI-ANTENNES LORS D'UNE RECEPTION DE CANAL COMMUN FM POUR UNE FREQUENCE DE RECEPTION | [2016/23] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 05.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2015 | AL | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.10.2015 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
NO | 13.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6141536 (CVETKOVIC MILAN [GB], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 6, line 36 * * figures 1, 2, 6 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 5-8,10,11; | [YDA]EP1619804 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 2-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0034] * * figure 2 * [A] 1,5-11 | by applicant | EP1619804 |