EP3029497 - WIRE GRID POLARIZER, DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2022/30] |
Former [2016/23] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SON, Jung-Ha 19 Nohae-ro 70-gil Dobong-gu 1905-1101 Seoul / KR | 02 /
LEE, Joo-Hyung 181 Seohyeon-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 205-504 / KR | 03 /
YEO, Yun-Jong 120, Seolleung-ro Gangnam-gu 3-1103 Seoul / KR | 04 /
CHO, Hyun Bin 100, Jeongjail-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do No C-1505 / KR | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 15189270.0 | 12.10.2015 | [2016/23] | Priority number, date | KR20140173737 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140173737 | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3029497 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3029497 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3029497 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
G02B5/3058 (EP,CN,US);
G02B5/30 (KR);
G02B5/3008 (KR);
G02B5/3016 (KR);
G02F1/133548 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2016/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTGITTERPOLARISATOR, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/23] | English: | WIRE GRID POLARIZER, DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME | [2016/23] | French: | POLARISEUR À GRILLE DE FILS, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2016/23] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
IT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004125449 (SALES TASSO R [US]) [X] 8 * figure 8 *; | [A]WO2006034051 (RADIANT IMAGES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 5-6 *; | [A]US2009283768 (WANG GANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP2322979 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0030] *; | [A]US2012057106 (PARK KUN SIK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 8 *; | [A]EP2487531 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* figures 3-5 *; | [XAI]US2014133027 (JANG DAE-HWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0098] * [A] 11-15 [I] 4,6,10 |