blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3011866

EP3011866 - TABLE LEG AND TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sedus Stoll AG
Brückenstrasse 15
79761 Waldshut / DE
[2016/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MAIER, Klaus
Weiherhalde 15
79875 Dachsberg / DE
02 / DONNER, Siegfried
Tannenstraße 38a
79761 Waldshut / DE
 [2016/17]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/17]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date15189450.813.10.2015
[2016/17]
Priority number, dateDE20141022124020.10.2014         Original published format: DE102014221240
[2016/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3011866
Date:27.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3011866
Date:26.07.2017
Language:DE
[2017/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2016
ClassificationIPC:A47B91/02
[2016/17]
CPC:
A47B91/024 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
TitleGerman:TISCHBEIN UND TISCH[2016/17]
English:TABLE LEG AND TABLE[2016/17]
French:PIED DE TABLE ET TABLE[2016/17]
Examination procedure08.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/20]
03.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2017Fee for grant paid
08.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)30.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.10.2015
AL26.07.2017
CY26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MK26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
PT26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
TR26.07.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/28]HU13.10.2015
CY26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MK26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
PT26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
TR26.07.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2020/15]HU13.10.2015
CY26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MK26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
TR26.07.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2019/52]HU13.10.2015
CY26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MK26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2019/47]HU13.10.2015
CY26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2019/31]HU13.10.2015
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/45]CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/36]CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
LU13.10.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/26]CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/12]ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/11]ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[IY]US3038194  (HERBERT ARENSON) [I] 1,2,4-16 * column 1, lines 9-10 * * column 2, lines 43-45 * * column 2, lines 63-65 * * column 3, lines 2-7 * * column 5, lines 37-49 * * figures 1,4,7 * [Y] 12;
 [Y]DE29821851U  (MUEHLEN GUENTER VON DER [DE]) [Y] 12 * page 6, lines 4-15 - lines 18-21 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3052058  (WALSH FRANCIS J, et al) [A] 1-4,11 * column 2, lines 44-54 - lines 65-68 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US3342445  (BOUWKAMP HARVEY L) [A] 1-3 * figures 4,5,8,9 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.