EP3012041 - RETENTION AND RELEASE MECHANISM FOR A POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avdel UK Ltd. Stanley House Works Road Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 1JY / GB | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mezzaqui, Oriano Mezzaqui s.r.l. Via del Tornitore 1 40138 Bologna / IT | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | SBD IPAdmin 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2016/17] | Shaya, Darrin Maurice, et al Black & Decker Europe 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15189736.0 | 14.10.2015 | [2016/17] | Priority number, date | GB20140018586 | 20.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201418586 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3012041 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3012041 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/10 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
B21J15/105 (EP,US);
B25B27/0014 (EP,CN,US);
B21J15/30 (GB);
B21J15/32 (US);
B25B23/0035 (GB);
B25B27/0007 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2016/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALTE- UND LÖSEMECHANISMUS FÜR EIN ANGETRIEBENES WERKZEUG | [2016/17] | English: | RETENTION AND RELEASE MECHANISM FOR A POWER TOOL | [2016/17] | French: | MÉCANISME DE RETENUE ET DE LIBÉRATION POUR UN OUTIL ENTRAÎNÉ | [2016/17] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 30.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2015 | AL | 14.03.2018 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | RS | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | IE | 14.10.2018 | LU | 14.10.2018 | MT | 14.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.10.2018 | ||
LU | 14.10.2018 | ||
MT | 14.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.10.2018 | ||
LU | 14.10.2018 | ||
MT | 14.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.10.2018 | ||
LU | 14.10.2018 | ||
MT | 14.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.10.2018 | ||
LU | 14.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 14.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 14.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 14.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1392459 (NEWFREY LLC [US]) [I] 1-5,7,12* paragraphs [0062] - [0064]; figures 13,13a *; | [X]US2004118176 (NERI FRANK J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figure - *; | [X]US2009084229 (VILLANUEVA RAMON C [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034]; figures 2,3,4,12 *; | [XP]WO2015112372 (ENGINEERED INSERTS & SYSTEMS INC [US]) [XP] 1-12 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figures 6,7A * |