EP3005959 - SYSTEMS FOR ACCESSING A BODILY OPENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SURTI, Vihar C. 103 Cheswyck Lane Winston-salem, NC 27105 / US | 02 /
HASHIBA, Kiyoshi Rua Anatolia 105 0547-000 Sao Paulo / BR | 03 /
INGRAM, Kimberly K. 811 Spring Street Mt. Airy, NC 27030 / US | [2019/14] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
SURTI, Vihar C. 103 Cheswyck Lane Winston-salem, NC North Carolina 27105 / US | ||
02 /
HASHIBA, Kiyoshi Rua Anatolia 105 0547-000 Sao Paulo / BR | |||
03 /
INGRAM, Kimberly K. 811 Spring Street Mt. Airy, NC 27030 / US | |||
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
SURTI, Vihar C. 103 Cheswyck Lane Winston-salem, NC North Carolina 27105 / US | ||
02 /
HASHIBA, Kiyoshi Rua Anatolia 105 0547-000 Sao Paulo / BR | |||
03 /
INGRAM, Kimberly K. 6014 Brentwood Park Place Rural Hall, NY New York 27045 / US | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 15189805.3 | 15.05.2009 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | US20080053426P | 15.05.2008 Original published format: US 53426 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005959 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3005959 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/3423 (EP,US);
A61B17/3421 (EP,US);
A61B17/3431 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3419 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2016/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR DEN ZUGANG ZU EINER KÖRPERÖFFNUNG | [2016/15] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR ACCESSING A BODILY OPENING | [2016/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR ACCÉDER À UNE OUVERTURE CORPORELLE | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 23.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09747675.8 / EP2323569 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2009 | AT | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | ES | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | IE | 15.05.2019 | LU | 15.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | GB | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5197971 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,2 ** column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 33 *; | [A]US2003093104 (BONNER MATTHEW D [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0054]; figures 9-11 *; | [A]US6652492 (BELL PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 3 * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 8 * * column 10, line 18 - column 11, line 10 * * column 13, lines 27-54 *; | [A]US2005056292 (COOPER JOEL D [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * * figure 4k *; | [XI]EP1803423 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9,11 * figures 1-5 * [I] 4,7; | [A]US2008039786 (EPSTEIN SAMUEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 9B * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * | by applicant | US4580568 | US20080025985 |