Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3000808 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3000808



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 525
01.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
31.08.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
23.08.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.08.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 58
23.08.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 58
21.08.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
19.07.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
13.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
13.07.2017 Description Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.07.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.07.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
16.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 58
16.06.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 58
07.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 Description Search / examination 52
07.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.03.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.02.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
29.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
29.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.04.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.03.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.01.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
04.01.2016 European search report Search / examination 4
04.01.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.12.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.10.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 6
14.10.2015 Description Search / examination 61
14.10.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
14.10.2015 Drawings Search / examination 3
14.10.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67