EP3025644 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR RECORDING ELECTRIC SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartels, Marc Novalisstrasse 17 10115 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Philipp, Jens - verstorben / DE | 03 /
Fandrey, Stephan Centralweg 6 8910 Affoltern am Albis / CH | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Galander, Marcus Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Galander, Marcus Biotronik SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 15190506.4 | 20.10.2015 | [2016/22] | Priority number, date | US201462085248P | 27.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462085248 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025644 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0408 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
A61B5/6832 (EP,US);
A61B5/259 (EP);
A61B7/02 (US);
A61B8/4236 (US);
A61B2562/225 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORANORDNUNG ZUR ABLEITUNG ELEKTRISCHER SIGNALE | [2016/22] | English: | SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR RECORDING ELECTRIC SIGNALS | [2016/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DESTINÉ À FAIRE DÉRIVER DES SIGNAUX ÉLECTRIQUES | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 10.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008114220 (BANET MATTHEW JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-5B * [I] 13; | [XA]US2008312524 (SOLOSKO THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 2A-9 *[A] 2-8,10-13; | [XI]DE102009035018 (DRAEGER MEDICAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,10,11 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 1,2,7-9 * [I] 13; | [X]US2011092790 (WILDER-SMITH OLIVER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1-6B *; | [X]WO2012158652 (PARACE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-12 * page 9, line 14 - page 12, line 13 * * page 14, line 1 - line 27 * * figures 1-5,8-9B *; | [X]WO2014128237 (SKRABAL FALKO [AT]) [X] 1-3,8,10,11 * page 22, line 7 - page 24, line 14 * * figure 8 * |