EP3040206 - PRINTER HAVING DUPLEX PRINTING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riso Kagaku Corporation 5-34-7, Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8385 / JP | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagata, Akihiro c/o RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION 2-8-1 Gakuen Minami Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki, 305-0818 / JP | 02 /
Hara, Masashi c/o RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION 2-8-1 Gakuen Minami Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki, 305-0818 / JP | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 15190564.3 | 20.10.2015 | [2016/27] | Priority number, date | JP20140216264 | 23.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014216264 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3040206 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3040206 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3040206 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/60, B41J13/00 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
B41J13/0009 (EP,US);
B41J13/0045 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (US);
B41J3/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | DRUCKER MIT DUPLEXDRUCKFUNKTION | [2016/27] | English: | PRINTER HAVING DUPLEX PRINTING FUNCTION | [2016/27] | French: | IMPRIMANTE À FONCTION D'IMPRESSION DUPLEX | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 25.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2015 | AL | 24.05.2017 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | DK | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | ES | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | IT | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | MK | 24.05.2017 | NL | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | RS | 24.05.2017 | SE | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | SM | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | NO | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | IE | 20.10.2017 | LU | 20.10.2017 | MT | 20.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PT | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
MK | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/41] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.10.2015 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
IE | 20.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
MT | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 20.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
SM | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
DK | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
RS | 24.05.2017 | ||
SE | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
NO | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006072138 (NAKANISHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0120]; figures 1-33; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2012161388 (YAMAGISHI RYOTA [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-6; claims 1-3 *; | [A]JP2001282050 (CANON KK) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-25; claims 1-18 * | by applicant | JP2012126541 |