Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
29.06.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.12.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.11.2019 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
01.11.2019 | Change - representative | |
18.10.2019 | Change - classification | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 | Change - classification | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 | Change - German title | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 | Change - English title | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 | Change - French title | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
30.11.2018 | Change - applicant | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
19.10.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.10.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.10.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
20.10.2017 | Change - designated states | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
18.10.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2017 | Change - inventor | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
24.03.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
23.10.2015 | Change - representative |