Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3016372
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.10.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.06.2020 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.12.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.11.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
08.04.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.07.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
02.11.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.05.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
01.04.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
29.10.2015 |
Change - representative |
|