EP3016372 - PANORAMA PHOTOGRAPHING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan District Taoyuan City 330 / TW | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liao, Scott Chien-Hung HTC Corporation No.88 Section 3, Zhongxing Rd. 231 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Chen, Horng-Lin HTC Corporation No.88 Section 3, Zhongxing Rd. 231 New Taipei City / TW | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Ljungberg, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15191865.3 | 28.10.2015 | [2016/18] | Priority number, date | US201414528413 | 30.10.2014 Original published format: US201414528413 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3016372 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PANORAMAFOTOGRAFIEVERFAHREN | [2016/18] | English: | PANORAMA PHOTOGRAPHING METHOD | [2016/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PHOTOGRAPHIE PANORAMIQUE | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 31.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2019 | 29.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006238617 (TAMIR MICHAEL [IL]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0090] * * figures 3,4,9,10 * [A] 5-10; | [A]US2010066810 (RYU HYE JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0162] ** figures 9A-9D,17A-17C,19D *; | [XY]US2010134641 (MARTI STEFAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 2,7-10,13 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US2013033566 (SENTO KAZUYA [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0223] * * figure 27B * |