EP3015145 - DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANAGING USER INFORMATION BASED ON IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Ji-in 108-102 1197 Ori-ro Guro-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
KANG, Min-jeong 118-1804 36 Gwongwang-ro 260beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15191948.7 | 28.10.2015 | [2016/18] | Priority number, date | KR20140150635 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: KR 20140150635 | KR20150070566 | 20.05.2015 Original published format: KR 20150070566 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015145 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/58, A63F13/65 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
A63F13/65 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (CN);
G06T13/40 (US);
A63F13/58 (EP,US);
A63F13/825 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0482 (CN,US);
G06F3/04845 (CN,US);
G06T13/80 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON BENUTZERINFORMATIONEN BASIEREND AUF EINEM BILD | [2016/18] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANAGING USER INFORMATION BASED ON IMAGE | [2016/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS D'UTILISATEUR SUR LA BASE D'UNE IMAGE | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/18] | 09.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008108965 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT US [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] ** paragraph [0052] *; | [I]WO2009073607 (NIKE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] *; | [I]US2009300525 (JOLLIFF MARIA ELENA ROMERA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0130] *; | [I]US2011239143 (YE LAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]WO2013152455 (INTEL CORP [SA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 4, line 15 * |