EP3021550 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING INTERNET ATTACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLEAFY S.R.L. Via della Malvasia 30 38122 Trento / IT | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/20] | For all designated states Pastore, Nicolo Via Guido Rossa, 5 20016 Pero, MI / IT | ||
For all designated states Giangregorio, Carmine Via del Gonfalone, 3 20123 Milano / IT | |||
For all designated states Rimmaudo, Paolo Via G. Rossini, 9 20092 Cinisello Balsamo, MI / IT | |||
For all designated states Bogana, Matteo Paolo Via IV Novembre,59 28065 Cerano, NO / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Perani & Partners S.p.A. Piazza Armando Diaz, 7 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Ciceri, Fabio, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15191950.3 | 28.10.2015 | [2016/20] | Priority number, date | US201462079337P | 13.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462079337 P | EP20140192969 | 13.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14192969 | [2016/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021550 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
H04L63/1466 (EP);
G06F21/554 (EP);
G06F2221/032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON INTERNETANGRIFFE | [2016/20] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING INTERNET ATTACKS | [2016/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR IDENTIFIER DES ATTAQUES D'INTERNET | [2016/20] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009327411 (DANG YA BIN [CN], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045] *; | [I]US2012291129 (SHULMAN AMICHAI [IL], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A]US2012198528 (BAUMHOF ANDREAS [AU]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |