Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016131028 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014222870 | 10.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014222870 | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014222870 | 10.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3018300 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2017 | B1 | EP3018300 | 11.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014222870 | 10.11.2014 | DE102015219156 | 05.10.2015 |