EP3017901 - TIG WELDING TORCH WITH ARC-SHAPED GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fronius International GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBINGER, Manfred Strasserbauerberg 18 4550 Kremsmünster / AT | 02 /
LEEB, Josef Stapfenstraße 6 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 03 /
PÜHRINGER, Stefan Theuerwang 1 4655 Vorchdorf / AT | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 15192498.2 | 02.11.2015 | [2016/19] | Priority number, date | AT20140050803 | 04.11.2014 Original published format: AT 508032014 | [2016/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017901 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3017901 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/12, B23K9/29 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
B23K9/296 (EP,US);
B23K9/29 (AT);
B23K9/28 (CN);
B23K9/126 (US);
B23K9/167 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | B23K9/173, B23K9/29, B23K9/167, B23K9/133, B23K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2016/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WIG-SCHWEISSBRENNER MIT KREISBOGENFÖRMIGER FÜHRUNG | [2016/19] | English: | TIG WELDING TORCH WITH ARC-SHAPED GUIDE | [2016/19] | French: | CHALUMEAU DE SOUDURE PAR GAZ INERTE DE TUNGSTENE AVEC UN GUIDAGE EN FORME D'ARC | [2016/19] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 18.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2015 | AL | 30.01.2019 | CY | 30.01.2019 | CZ | 30.01.2019 | DK | 30.01.2019 | EE | 30.01.2019 | ES | 30.01.2019 | FI | 30.01.2019 | HR | 30.01.2019 | LT | 30.01.2019 | LV | 30.01.2019 | MC | 30.01.2019 | MK | 30.01.2019 | MT | 30.01.2019 | NL | 30.01.2019 | PL | 30.01.2019 | RO | 30.01.2019 | RS | 30.01.2019 | SE | 30.01.2019 | SI | 30.01.2019 | SK | 30.01.2019 | SM | 30.01.2019 | TR | 30.01.2019 | BG | 30.04.2019 | NO | 30.04.2019 | GR | 01.05.2019 | IS | 30.05.2019 | PT | 30.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.11.2015 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.11.2015 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 30.01.2019 | |
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007017912 (FLOOD DALE A [US], et al) [X] 1-9* paragraph [0033]; figure 7 *; | [X]EP2322306 (EIPA EISEN PALMEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US7329827 | CN102825368 |