EP3165510 - CENTRIFUGAL PUMP ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Holding A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2017/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahlqvist, Mathis Sdr Vang 30 7100 Vejle / DK | 02 /
Guldbæk Smith, Christian Plantagen 22 8541 Skødstrup / DK | 03 /
Iversen, Kåre Hammelvej 139 8870 Langå / DK | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 15192735.7 | 03.11.2015 | [2017/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165510 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32, G01N15/02, G01N15/06, G01N15/10, G01N33/18, F04D15/02, F04D1/00, F04D13/06 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
F04D15/0066 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/008 (EP,US);
C02F1/30 (CN);
C02F1/32 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/38 (EP,US);
F04D1/00 (EP,CN,US);
F04D13/06 (EP,CN,US);
F04D15/0088 (US);
F04D15/0209 (EP,CN,US);
F04D15/0281 (EP,US);
F04D29/669 (EP);
G01N33/1893 (EP,US);
C02F1/307 (EP,US);
C02F1/36 (EP,US);
C02F2209/001 (EP,US);
C02F2209/005 (EP,US);
C02F2209/03 (EP,US);
C02F2209/105 (EP,US);
C02F2301/043 (EP,US);
C02F2307/00 (EP,US);
E03B5/00 (EP,US);
G01N15/075 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2064 (EP,US);
G01N2015/0053 (EP,US);
G01N2015/019 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2017/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISELPUMPENAGGREGAT | [2017/19] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL PUMP ASSEMBLY | [2017/19] | French: | GROUPE POMPE CENTRIFUGE | [2017/19] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013043045 (STICHTING WETSUS CT EXCELLENCE SUSTAINABLE WATER TECHNOLOGY [NL]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 13 * * page 13, line 5 - line 25 ** figure 2 *; | [X]US2014086764 (STINESSEN KJELL OLAV [NO], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * figure 4 *; | [X]WO2015123236 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | EP2469264 | EP20140186884 |