EP3006641 - A ROOF WINDOW WITH A TOP SASH MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Jimmy Skjold Lundevej 13 5591 Gelsted / DK | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 15193223.3 | 04.10.2012 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | DK20110070550 | 04.10.2011 Original published format: DK 201170550 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006641 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/03, E06B7/10, F24F13/18, E04D13/035 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
E04D13/0325 (EP);
E04D13/0354 (EP);
E06B7/10 (EP);
F24F13/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DACHFENSTER MIT EINEM OBEREN SCHIEBERAHMENMODUL | [2016/15] | English: | A ROOF WINDOW WITH A TOP SASH MODULE | [2016/15] | French: | FENÊTRE DE TOIT AVEC UN MODULE DE CHÂSSIS SUPÉRIEUR | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 20.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2021 | Observations by third parties | 27.06.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12778227.4 / EP2751355 | Divisional application(s) | EP23161705.1 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 20.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 20.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2017 | Decision despatched | 20.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9951832 (VELUX IND AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-14* figure 2 *; | [XI]WO03001017 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * [I] 3-14; | [XI]WO2007028590 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1, 5-7, 11-13 * * page 29, line 9 * [I] 3-14 | by applicant | GB1028251 | WO9928581 | other | EP2565355 |