EP3023194 - MULTIPLE SPINDLE ROTATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Index-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Hahn & Tessky Plochinger Strasse 92 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumacher, Karl-Heinz Jakob-Kurz-Strasse 67 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 15193649.9 | 03.03.2011 | [2016/21] | Priority number, date | DE20101002804 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010002804 | [2016/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023194 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023194 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/12, B23Q39/04, B23B9/00, H02K1/20, H02K16/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B23B9/005 (EP,US);
B23Q11/127 (US);
B23Q11/12 (EP,US);
B23Q39/044 (EP,US);
H02K1/20 (EP,US);
H02K16/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | B23Q11/12, B23Q39/04, B23B9/00, H02K1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2016/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSPINDELDREHMASCHINE | [2016/21] | English: | MULTIPLE SPINDLE ROTATING MACHINE | [2016/21] | French: | TOUR MULTIBROCHE | [2016/21] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 21.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11707825.3 / EP2544854 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2011 | AL | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | MT | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.03.2011 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5620646 (SPARER RONALD M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 30-42 *; | [A]WO9807227 (TURBO GENSET COMPANY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1* pages 4-5 *; | [A]DE10022138 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-2 *; | [AD]WO03013781 (INDEX WERKE KG HAHN & TESSKY [DE], et al) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1414615 |