EP3051813 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) BROADCAST SERVICE PROVIDING METHOD AND 3D BROADCAST PROVIDING APPARATUS PERFORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 218 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-700 / KR | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Joo Young No. 112-1205, 5, Cheongsa-ro, Seo-gu 302-748 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sung Hoon No.304-902, Gajang-ro, Seo-gu 302-726 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Jin Soo No.801-1001 98, Banseokseo-ro, Yuseong-gu 305-750 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
KIM, Jin Woong No.207-704, 10, Hakhanam-ro, Yuseong-gu 305-365 Daejeon / KR | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 15193660.6 | 09.11.2015 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | KR20150012898 | 27.01.2015 Original published format: KR 20150012898 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3051813 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N21/2362 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
H04N21/2362 (EP);
H04N13/194 (EP,KR);
H04N13/167 (EP);
H04N13/172 (KR);
H04N13/359 (KR);
H04N21/242 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES 3D-RUNDFUNKDIENSTES UND DIESEN DURCHFÜHRENDE 3D-RUNDFUNKTBEREITSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/31] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) BROADCAST SERVICE PROVIDING METHOD AND 3D BROADCAST PROVIDING APPARATUS PERFORMING THE SAME | [2016/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICE DE DIFFUSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE (3D) ET APPAREIL DE FOURNITURE DE DIFFUSION 3D APPLIQUANT LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009119955 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,11-14 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 6-10; | [A]EP2373042 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2013183947 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * |